blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979253

EP0979253 - PHTHALOCYANINE INK-JET DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avecia Limited
Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / CARR, Kathryn
Hexagon House P.O. Box 42 Blackley
Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Fawkes, David Melville, et al
AVECIA Limited, Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley
Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Fawkes, David Melville, et al
AVECIA Limited, Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
Application number, filing date98914990.106.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998GB01014
Priority number, dateGB1997000853226.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708532
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9849239
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979253
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979253
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:C09B47/26, C09D11/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
C09D11/328 (EP,US); C09B47/26 (EP,US); Y10S8/919 (US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/07]
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLPHTHALOCYANINFARBSTOFFE[2000/07]
English:PHTHALOCYANINE INK-JET DYES[2000/07]
French:COLORANTS A BASE DE PHTALOCYANINE POUR ENCRES D'IMPRIMANTES A JET D'ENCRE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1999National basic fee paid 
26.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
03.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2002Fee for grant paid
19.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.10.2002
FR30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
DE31.01.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/02]CH30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
DE31.01.2003
Former [2003/39]CH30.10.2002
LI30.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]FR927444  (ICI) [A] 1* page 1, line 46 - line 51 *;
 [A]GB1490820  (ICI LTD) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 13 - line 41 *;
 [A]DE2812261  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-7 * page 50; example 408 *;
 [A]EP0519395  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 42 - line 42; examples 89,104 *;
 [Y]EP0596383  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9713811  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.