EP1008088 - PROCEDURE OF ALIGNING OBJECTS IN A FIELD AND APPLICATION OF THE PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mraovic, Dusan 2540 Marron Rd., Apt. 203 Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2007/33] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Mraovic, Dusan 1406 Plateau Dr. Allen, TX 75002 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Mraovic, Dusan Lütticher Strasse 10 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, et al Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, et al Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Thul, Hermann, et al European Patent Attorney, Patentanwälte Jostarndt & Thul, Eupener Strasse 266 52070 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98915038.8 | 30.04.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998IB00659 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957667 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008088 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A63F9/22 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G09B19/00 (EP,US);
G09B23/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN EINEM FELD UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2000/24] | English: | PROCEDURE OF ALIGNING OBJECTS IN A FIELD AND APPLICATION OF THE PROCEDURE | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDURE D'ALIGNEMENT D'OBJETS DANS UN CHAMP ET APPLICATION DE LADITE PROCEDURE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2000 | 30.04.2014 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5312113 (TA-HSIEN CHEN [TW], et al) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 59; figures 1-9 * [A] 1-7,9,10; | [A]DE19527860 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 12 *; | [A]US5456607 (ANTONIAK PETER R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5423556 (LATYPOV NOURAKHMED [RU]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 15 * | [XAY] - COLDWELL R A, "Problem-based learning and computer games in design education", COMPUTER EDUCATION, FEB. 1996, COMPUT. EDUC. GROUP STAFFORDSHIRE UNIV, UK, ISSN 0010-4590, no. 82, pages 2 - 5, XP002089712 [X] 1,10 * page 2, column L, line 1 - page 3, column R, line 16 * [A] 2-7,9 [Y] 8 |