EP0975684 - NONAQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF VINYL FLUORIDE INTERPOLYMERS& x9; [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/05] | VINYL FLUORIDE INTERPOLYMERS | ||
[2007/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USCHOLD, Ronald, Earl 1104 Dorset Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98915521.3 | 14.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998US07378 | Priority number, date | US19970043556P | 15.04.1997 Original published format: US 43556 P | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846658 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975684 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975684 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/20, C08F214/26, C08F214/18 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
C08F214/18 (EP,US);
C08F214/20 (EP,US);
C08F214/26 (EP,US);
Y10S250/909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/05] | Title | German: | NICHT WÄSSRIGE DISPERSIONEN VON VINYLFLUORID INTERPOLYMEREN | [2007/32] | English: | NONAQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF VINYL FLUORIDE INTERPOLYMERS& x9; | [2007/32] | French: | DISPERSIONS NON AQUEUSES DE COPOLYMÈRES DE VINYLS FLUORÉS | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/05] | VINYLFLUORID INTERPOLYMERE | ||
Former [2000/05] | VINYL FLUORIDE INTERPOLYMERS | ||
Former [2000/05] | INTERPOLYMERES DE FLUOROETHENE | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 01.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2008 | Decision despatched | 22.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Cited in | International search | [YD]US3428618 (COOK JACK E, et al) [YD] 1,20,21 * column 3, line 5 - line 75 ** claim - *; | [XY]US3966660 (TAMURA YORIKAZU, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-20,24-26 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 7 - line 22 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 9 * * column 7, line 16 - line 30 * * column 9, line 57 - line 66 * * example - * * claims 1,2,8 * * idem. * [Y] 1,20,21; | [A]WO9628477 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [A] 1,15,19 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 9 * * page 9, line 26 - line 30 * * claims 1-3,6,7 * |