blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976043

EP0976043 - MAPPED VIRTUAL STORAGE (MVS) BACKUP SYSTEM FOR A DATA PROCESSOR USING A DATA STORAGE SUBSYSTEM SNAPSHOT COPY CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]MVS DEVICE BACKUP SYSTEM FOR A DATA PROCESSOR USING A DATA STORAGE SUBSYSTEM SNAPSHOT COPY CAPABILITY
[2001/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
2270 South 88th Street
Louisville, CO 80028-4309 / US
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITE, Michael, Wayne
1424 Cypress Circle
Lafayette, CO 80026 / US
02 / TOMSULA, Patrick, James
10834 West 79th Place
Arvada, CO 80005-3439 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Goodanew, Martin Eric, et al
MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham
Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Goodanew, Martin Eric, et al
MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date98915552.815.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07456
Priority number, dateUS1997084448018.04.1997         Original published format: US 844480
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9848347
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976043
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976043
Date:20.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/14
[2000/05]
CPC:
G06F11/1466 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/05]
TitleGerman:MAPPEDVIRTUELSYSTEM(MVS)-VORRICHTUNGSSICHERUNG FÜR EINEN DATENPROZESSOR UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER DATENSPEICHERUNGSUNTERSYSTEMSCHNAPPSCHUSSMÖGLICHKEIT[2001/15]
English:MAPPED VIRTUAL STORAGE (MVS) BACKUP SYSTEM FOR A DATA PROCESSOR USING A DATA STORAGE SUBSYSTEM SNAPSHOT COPY CAPABILITY[2001/15]
French:SYSTEME DE SAUVEGARDE DE MEMOIRE A MAPPING VIRTUEL (MVS) POUR PROCESSEUR DE DONNEES UTILISANT LA CAPACITE DE COPIE SELECTIVE D'UN SOUS-SYSTEME DE MEMORISATION DE DONNEES[2001/15]
Former [2000/05]MVS GERÄTSICHERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN DATENPROZESSOR UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER DATENSPEICHERUNGSUNTERSYSTEMSCHNAPPSCHUSSMÖGLICHKEIT
Former [2000/05]MVS DEVICE BACKUP SYSTEM FOR A DATA PROCESSOR USING A DATA STORAGE SUBSYSTEM SNAPSHOT COPY CAPABILITY
Former [2000/05]SYSTEME DE SAUVEGARDE MVS POUR PROCESSEUR DE DONNEES UTILISANT LA CAPACITE DE COPIE SELECTIVE D'UN SOUS-SYSTEME DE MEMORISATION DE DONNEES
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
05.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2001Fee for grant paid
31.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0566967  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 6 - line 54 *;
 [A]EP0767431  (STAC INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 26 - line 52 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.