blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975475

EP0975475 - PROTECTIVE ROLL GUARD FOR CLEARING OBSTACLES FROM CASTER WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Research Labs, Inc.
121 Stewart Street, Suite 205 Seattle
Washington 98121 / US
[2006/37]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Innovative Research Labs, Inc.
5725-60th Avenue Northeast
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TUPPER, Bradley, J.
5725 - 60th Avenue Northeast
Seattle, WA 98105 / US
02 / BENSON, James
2612 West Lake Sammamish Parkway Southeast
Bellevue, WA 98008 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Spall, Christopher John, et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Spall, Christopher John, et al
BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date98915612.015.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07727
Priority number, dateUS1997084457418.04.1997         Original published format: US 844574
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9847724
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975475
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975475
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60B33/00
[2000/05]
CPC:
B60B7/02 (EP,US); B60B33/00 (EP,US); B60B33/0015 (EP,US);
B60B7/061 (EP,US); B60B7/08 (EP,US); B60B2200/26 (EP,US);
B60B33/0039 (EP,US); B60B33/0049 (EP,US); B60B33/0055 (EP,US);
B60B33/0068 (EP,US); B60B33/0073 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG VOR HINDERNISSEN FÜR LENKROLLEN[2000/05]
English:PROTECTIVE ROLL GUARD FOR CLEARING OBSTACLES FROM CASTER WHEELS[2000/05]
French:GUIDE-GALET DE PROTECTION PERMETTANT A DES ROULETTES DE FRANCHIR LES OBSTACLES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1999National basic fee paid 
06.11.1999Search fee paid 
06.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
13.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2006Fee for grant paid
28.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06001660.7   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 31.08.2006
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
IE16.04.2007
[2008/25]
Former [2008/21]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2008/16]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/29]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/21]CH13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
Former [2007/17]CH13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
SE13.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]CH633996  (GROSS MICHEL CAMILLE [CH]) [A] 1,19* page 2, line 31 - line 68; figure - *;
 [XA]US5371920  (RAINVILLE DONALD [US]) [X] 1,2,17,18 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 19 * [A] 19
International search[A]US4176756  (GELLMAN BARRY N [US]);
 [X]US5170528  (NAVAR JOHN J [US], et al);
 [A]US5385373  (LOVE VAUGHN R [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.