EP0970497 - SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THILKER, Lutz Höhscheider Weg 12 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
ZACHARIAS, Albert Rembrandtstrasse 18 D-56566 Neuwied / DE | [2000/02] | Application number, filing date | 98916914.9 | 11.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP01386 | Priority number, date | DE1997112958 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712958 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844524 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970497 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970497 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/50, H01H3/60 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H01H1/50 (EP,US);
H01H3/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/04] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2000/02] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE | [2000/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.12.2002 | AT | 11.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | [2004/31] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 18.12.2002 | |
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1048980 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1025041 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5 * claim - *; | [A]DE2037552 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5 * page 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *; | [A]EP0353950 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4201956 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [X]DE29510909U (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * |