blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973503

EP0973503 - NON-AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
980 Great West Road Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
SmithKline Beecham plc
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN BRAAK, Maarten, SmithKline Beecham Cons.Br
The Royal Forest Factory
Coleford, Gloucestershire GL16 8JB / GB
[2000/04]
Representative(s)White, Susan Mary, et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]White, Susan Mary, et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date98916998.213.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01580
Priority number, dateGB1997000581320.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705813
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9842319
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973503
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/107, A61K9/48
[2000/04]
CPC:
A61K9/4858 (EP); A61K9/1075 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesSI13.09.1999
TitleGerman:NICHT-WÄSSRIGE ORAL ANZUWENDENDE ARZNEIZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/04]
English:NON-AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION[2000/04]
French:COMPOSITIONS NON AQUEUSES POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
03.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchRU2043339  [ ] (N PROIZV TOVARISHCHESTVO AKVA [RU]);
 [X]EP0670166  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1,10-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2643263  (GLAXO CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,10-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0196085  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4322826  (GALENIK LABOR FREIBURG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * the whole document *;
 JPS6067424  [ ] (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO);
 JPS58128141  [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO);
 JPH08259451  [ ] (LION CORP);
 [YD]WO9406310  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO9524832  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9102520  (CORTECS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [YPD]WO9710725  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [YPD] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 21, Database accession no. 96-207700 [21], XP002080684 [X] 1,2,8-13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 22, Database accession no. 85-130926 [25], XP002080685 [Y] 1-13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 36, Database accession no. 83-756026 [25], XP002080686 [Y] 1-13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 50, Database accession no. 96-502632, XP002080687 [Y] 1-13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930222), vol. 118, no. 8, Database accession no. 66767, XP002080683 [Y] 1-13 * abstract *
    [ ] - S.K.COLE ET AL., "STUDIES USING A NONIONIC SURFACTANT-CONTAINING DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM DESIGNED FOR HARD GELATIN CAPSULE COMPATIBILITY", INT. J. PHARM., (1992), vol. 88, no. 1-3, pages 211 - 220
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.