blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970295

EP0970295 - ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSP Innovative Automotive Systems GmbH
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LEIBER, Heinz, Karl
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
D-71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Lenzing, Andreas
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
40103 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr.
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98917064.224.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01709
Priority number, dateDE199711205624.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712056
DE199711205524.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712055
DE199714157120.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19741571
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842957
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970295
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970295
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:F01L9/04, H01F7/14
[2000/02]
CPC:
H01F7/1638 (EP,US); F01L9/20 (EP,US); H01F7/14 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2109 (EP); H01F2007/1692 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ANTRIEB[2000/02]
English:ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1999National basic fee paid 
31.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
30.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2000Fee for grant paid
21.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE20.09.2001
[2002/05]
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2334211  (SCHNEIDER CO OPTISCHE WERKE) [X] 1 * page 3, line 13 - line 20; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB1471537  (VENARD R) [A] 1 * page 4, line 66 - line 79; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]GB2088137  (VEISZ GYOERGY, et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 57 - line 80; figure 3 *;
 [DA]DE3616540  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 37 - line 50; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5161494  (BROWN JR JOHN N [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 39; figure 1 *;
 [PA]WO9717561  (AURA SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 7 * * page 7, line 19 - line 33 * * figure 1 *;
 [PA]DE19628860  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 42 * * column 4, line 6 - line 17 ** figure 1 *
by applicantEP0043426
 DE3616540
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.