EP0970330 - DIFFERENTIAL VALVE, SPECIALLY A CABIN AIR DISCHARGE VALVE IN AN AIRCRAFT, AND METHOD FOR REGULATING CABIN PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nord-Micro AG & Co. OHG Victor-Slotosch-Strasse 20 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/09] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Nord-Micro Elektronik Feinmechanik AG Viktor-Slotosch-Strasse 20 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINERT, Martin An der Pfingstweide 14 D-63500 Seligenstadt / DE | 02 /
RUMPLIK, Daniel 116 Mountain Road Hampden, MA 01036-9663 / US | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98917081.6 | 25.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP01758 | Priority number, date | DE1997113125 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19713125 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844300 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970330 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970330 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, F16K1/22 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
B64D13/04 (EP);
F16K51/00 (KR);
B64D13/02 (EP);
F16K1/22 (EP);
F16K39/024 (EP);
Y02T50/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/02] | Title | German: | STUFENVENTIL, INSBESONDERE KABINENABLUFTVENTIL IN EINEM FLUGGERÄT, UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG DES KABINENDRUCKS | [2000/02] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL VALVE, SPECIALLY A CABIN AIR DISCHARGE VALVE IN AN AIRCRAFT, AND METHOD FOR REGULATING CABIN PRESSURE | [2000/02] | French: | CLAPET A GRADINS, NOTAMMENT CLAPET D'AIR D'EVACUATION DE CABINE DANS UN APPAREIL VOLANT ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA PRESSION REGNANT DANS LA CABINE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE673453 (HENSCHEL FLUGZEUGWERKE AG) [Y] 1,17 * claim 1 * [A] 19; | [A]US2299865 (WHITTED JOHN B) [A] 8-10* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2349727 (HOPKINS DAVID W) [A] 1-4,10,13,18 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE1890465U (KOPPERS GMBH HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1-4,10 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0320490 (SCHMIDT FRITZ) [Y] 1,17 * column 8, line 22 - line 40; figures 7-9 * [A] 13 |