blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970263

EP0970263 - ELECTROLYTIC METHOD FOR RECOVERING AND RECYCLING SILVER FROM A NITRIC SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES
2, rue Paul Dautier
78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR
[2003/02]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
29-33, rue de la Fédération
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES
2, rue Paul Dautier
78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOURGES, Jacques
10, rue de Perthuis
F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR
02 / BROUDIC, Jean-Charles
2, parc du Grand Montagné
F-30400 Villeneuve-lès-Avignon / FR
03 / DAUBY, Jacques
24 ter, rue Mari Curie
F-84850 Camaret sur Aigues / FR
04 / LEBOUCHER, Isabelle
10, promenade Mona Lisa
F-78000 Versailles / FR
05 / LECLERC, Olivier
4, rue des Petits Chaumes
F-77250 Moret sur Loing / FR
06 / BATICLE, Pascal
Le Landy, 133, route de Fontainebleau
F-77140 Nonville / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Audier, Philippe André, et al
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Audier, Philippe André, et al
Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/02]Des Termes, Monique, et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98917210.123.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998FR00580
Priority number, dateFR1997000355224.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9703552
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842894
Date:01.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970263
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970263
Date:19.02.2003
Language:FR
[2003/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C25C1/20, C25B1/00, G21F9/06
[2000/02]
CPC:
G21F9/06 (EP,US); C25B1/00 (EP,US); C25C1/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/4678 (EP,US); Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG UND WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON SILBER AUS EINER WÄSSRIGEN SALPETERSÄURE-LÖSUNG[2000/02]
English:ELECTROLYTIC METHOD FOR RECOVERING AND RECYCLING SILVER FROM A NITRIC SOLUTION[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE ELECTROLYTIQUE DE RECUPERATION ET DE RECYCLAGE DE L'ARGENT A PARTIR D'UNE SOLUTION NITRIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase02.09.1999National basic fee paid 
02.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
11.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2002Fee for grant paid
23.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DA]JPH05188187  ;
 [A]FR2667080  (DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO [JP], et al)
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931109), vol. 017, no. 609, Database accession no. (P - 1640), & JP05188187 A 19930730 (POWER REACTOR & NUCLEAR FUEL DEV CORP) [DA] 1,7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.