EP0976295 - CONNECTIONLESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUGER, Roy, Harold 47 Beech Avenue Radlett, Hertfordshire WD7 7DD / GB | 02 /
BRUECKHEIMER, Simon, Daniel 74 Church Crescent London N10 3NE / GB | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road, Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Anderson, Angela, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group, Harlow Laboratories, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2000/05] | Ryan, John Peter William Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98917396.8 | 17.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998GB01128 | Priority number, date | GB19970007832 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9707832 | GB19970016333 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9716333 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848591 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976295 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976295 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04B7/185 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04B7/18578 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04B7/18584 (EP,US);
H04B7/18589 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5608 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5619 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5623 (EP,US);
H04L2012/563 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5634 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5638 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5645 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5656 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/05] | Title | German: | NACH DEM VERBINDUNGSLOSEN PRINZIP ARBEITENDES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2000/05] | English: | CONNECTIONLESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2000/05] | French: | RESEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS CONNEXION | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 16.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.06.2004 | [2006/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0748142 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 2; claims 1-10 *; | [PX] - MAUGER R ET AL, "QOS GUARANTEES FOR MULTIMEDIA SERVICES ON A TDMA-BASED SATELLITE NETWORK", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (199707), vol. 35, no. 7, pages 56 - 58, 63 - 65, XP000695132 [PX] 1-12 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.601743 | [X] - WERNER M ET AL, "ATM-BASED ROUTING IN LEO/MEO SATELLITE NETWORKS WITH INTERSATELLITELINKS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (199701), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 69 - 82, XP000637400 [X] 1-12 * see sections III and IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.553679 | [A] - MANKARIOUS R R, "A FULL MESH ASYNCHRONOUS TRANSFER MODE (ATM) SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (MILCOM), SAN DIEGO, NOV. 6 - 8, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19951106), VOL. 1, pages 11 - 15, XP000580737 [A] 1-12 * see sections II and III D * | [A] - SHUJI TASAKA, "LINK-LEVEL CONNECTION CONTROL SCHEMES IN A HIGH-SPEED SATELLITE DATA NETWORK: A PERFORMANCE COMPARISON", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19920201), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 437 - 446, XP000272924 [A] 1-12 * see section II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.126994 |