blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977963

EP0977963 - LIGHT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Nuclear Fuels PLC
Risley Warrington
Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB
[2006/26]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
British Nuclear Fuels PLC
Risley Warrington Cheshire, WA3 6AS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WILSON, Graham, John-British Nuclear Fuels plc
The Product Development Centre-Capenhurst
NR Chester CH1 9ER / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Goddard, David John, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Goddard, David John, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple
Stockport SK6 6BD / GB
Application number, filing date98917418.020.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998GB01151
Priority number, dateGB1997000845026.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708450
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9849489
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977963
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977963
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:F21V19/04, G21C17/08
[2000/06]
CPC:
G21C17/08 (EP,US); F21V19/04 (EP,US); G21F7/043 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:LICHTVORRICHTUNGSAUFBAU[2000/06]
English:LIGHT ASSEMBLY[2000/06]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ECLAIRAGE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1999National basic fee paid 
17.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
30.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2006Fee for grant paid
25.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]CH28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1494949  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [X] 1,3,12-14,20-22 * page 1, column L, lines 1-9 * * page 2, column R, lines 27-33 * * page 2, column R, lines 50-54; figures 1-3 * * page 1, column R, line 31- - page 2, column L, line 10 * * page 2, column L, line 36 - column R, line 3 *;
 [XA]GB1109078  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [X] 1,3,4,20,22 * page 1, lines 10-22 * * page 2, line 114 - page 3, line 4; figures 1,6 * [A] 6,7,9,10,12,13;
 [A]US2868992  (MONK GEORGE S) [A] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * column 1, lines 15-24 * * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 3 * * column 6, lines 5-21; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]GB503393  (WALLACE & TIERNAN INC) [A] 1,15,16 * page 1, columns 22-26 * * page 2, lines 81-87; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0331064  (EURATOM [LU]) [A] 1,4,5,20 * column 1 * * column 3, lines 10-14 * * column 3, lines 22-24 * * page 4, lines 24-35; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.