14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
10.09.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
07.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
19.09.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
10.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.04.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] |
17.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.06.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
18.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
17.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
14.01.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
14.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|