blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971952

EP0971952 - DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND REAGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Royal Netherlands Academy of Arts and Sciences
P.O. Box 19121
1000 GC Amsterdam / NL
For all designated states
Erasmus Universiteit Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein, Burb Oudlaan 50, P.O. Box 1738
3000 DR Rotterdam / NL
For all designated states
Universiteit Utrecht
Universiteitsweg 100
3584 CG Utrecht / NL
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN LEEUWEN, Frederik, W.
Kerkweg 37
NL-3063 CL Maarssen / NL
02 / GROSVELD, Franklin, G.
Jacobusvan Vessemsingel 9
NL-3065 NH Rotterdam / NL
03 / BURBACH, Johannes, Peter, Henri
Koperslagershoek 9
NL-3981 SB Bunnik / NL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/03]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date98917502.102.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IB00705
Priority number, dateUS19970043163P10.04.1997         Original published format: US 43163 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9845322
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971952
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, C12N15/85, A61K48/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
G01N33/6896 (EP); A61P21/04 (EP); A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); C12Q1/6827 (EP); C12Q1/6858 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP); G01N33/6893 (EP); C12Q2600/156 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesAL19.10.1999
LT19.10.1999
LV19.10.1999
MK19.10.1999
RO19.10.1999
SI19.10.1999
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND REAGENZIEN[2000/03]
English:DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND REAGENTS[2000/03]
French:REACTIFS POUR DIAGNOSTICS ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/26]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0341491  (MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-14,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9532731  (UNIV OXFORD [GB], et al) [X] 15,16,19 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9405811  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [Y] 25-39 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9402595  (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US]) [Y] 25,26,31,33-35,38,39 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP0332667  (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]) [DY] 31-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5455169  (MULLAN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0451700  (MILES INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5449604  (SCHELLENBERG GERARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9712992  (ROYAL NETHERLANDS ACADEMY OF A [NL], et al) [PX] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [DXY]  - EVANS ET AL., "Frameshift mutations at two hotspots in vasopressin transcripts in post-mitotic neurons", PNAS, (199406), vol. 91, pages 6059 - 6063, XP002030376 [DX] 1-23 * the whole document * [Y] 25-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.13.6059
 [Y]  - BIRIKH K R ET AL, "THE STRUCTURE, FUNCTION AND APPLICATION OF THE HAMMERHEAD RIBOZYME", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (199704), vol. 245, no. 1, pages 1 - 16, XP002045195 [Y] 25,26,31,33-35,38,39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.t01-3-00001.x
 [A]  - SHERRINGTON ET AL., "Cloning of a gene bearing missense mutations in early-onset familial Alzheimer's disease", NATURE, (19950629), vol. 375, pages 754 - 760, XP002030378 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/375754a0
 [A]  - SHIBATA D ET AL, "GENOMIC INSTABILITY IN REPEATED SEQUENCES IS AN EARLY SOMATIC EVENT IN COLORECTAL TUMORIGENESIS THAT PERSISTS AFTER TRANSFORMATION", NATURE GENETICS, (19940301), vol. 6, pages 273 - 281, XP000571411 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0394-273
 [A]  - KOHN D B ET AL, "GENE THERAPY FOR AIDS: RETROVIRAL VECTORS ENCODING ANTISENSE RNA, RIBOZYMES AND TRANS-DOMINANT INHIBITORY MUTANT HIV-1 GENES", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (19930329), no. SUPPL. 17E, page 201, XP002035849 [A] 25-39 * the whole document *
 [PXY]  - VAN LEEUWEN, "FRAMESHIFT MUTANTS OF BETA AMYLOID PRECURSOR PROTEIN AND UBIQUITIN-B IN ALZHEIMER'S AND DOWN PATIENTS", SCIENCE, (199801), vol. 279, pages 242 - 247, XP002091677 [PX] 1-24 * the whole document * [PY] 25-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5348.242
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.