EP0975242 - SHOE-COVERING PROTECTION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Toma S.R.L. Loc. S. Domenico, 79 66016 Guardiagrele / IT | For all designated states D'Andrea, Mariano Via S. Silvestro Colle, 102 65132 Pescara / IT | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ANDREA, Mariano Via S. Silvestro Colle, 102 I-65132 Pescara / IT | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Leone, Mario Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Leone, Mario Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 98917607.8 | 16.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998IT00089 | Priority number, date | IT1997PE00010U | 17.04.1997 Original published format: IT PE970010 U | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846099 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975242 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975242 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/16 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
A43B3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/05] | Title | German: | SCHUHBEDECKENDE SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG | [2000/05] | English: | SHOE-COVERING PROTECTION ASSEMBLY | [2000/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PROTECTION RECOUVRANT LA CHAUSSURE | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.04.2002 | CH | 03.04.2002 | FR | 03.04.2002 | IT | 03.04.2002 | LI | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | GB | 03.07.2002 | DE | 04.07.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
FR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | BE | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | CH | 03.04.2002 | |
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | CH | 03.04.2002 | |
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 03.04.2002 | |
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR482338 (HUTCHINSON DES ETS [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2108650 (CASEY EDWARD F) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2297656 (L HOLLIER LESLIE H) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1000700 (EINAR WILLIAM RANDERS SIGER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4788780 (BOGGS ERNEST R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]DE19509084 (SCHUERCH PRIMO [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5729915 (KHOO JOHN C Q [CA], et al) [PA] 1,2 * column W * |