EP0983124 - A SPRAY BOOM AND A METHOD OF SPRAYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patchett AG Air Limited 713 Birchwood Avenue Blenheim / NZ | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATCHETT, Raymond, Lester 713 Birchwood Avenue Blenheim / NZ | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 98917814.0 | 09.04.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998NZ00048 | Priority number, date | NZ19970314594 | 14.04.1997 Original published format: NZ 31459497 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9846364 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0983124 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/02 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
A01M7/006 (EP,US);
B05B15/5225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | NL [2000/10] | Title | German: | SPRÜHBALKEN UND SPRÜHVERFAHREN | [2000/10] | English: | A SPRAY BOOM AND A METHOD OF SPRAYING | [2000/10] | French: | RAMPE ET PROCEDE DE PULVERISATION | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 24.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2143154 (WATER RES CENTRE) [X] 1-11,15 * page 2, column L, line 37 - page 2, column R, line 126; figures 5-7 *; | [X]US4384674 (SOMERVILLE GRANT J [CA]) [X] 1-3,6,15 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 61 *; | [X]FR2388465 (GI PROEKTIR [SU]) [X] 15 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 3; figure - * | International search | [X]US2245668 (HODGES ALBERT B); | [Y]US4560107 (INCULET ION [CA]); | [A]US5025988 (LUND MAYNARD [US]); | [A]US2705170 (PEDIGO ARTHUR J); | [A]US4392613 (GRAFF HART F, et al) |