blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0983631

EP0983631 - POWER AMPLIFIER AND METHOD THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NORDWALL, Thomas, Jan, Peter
Lindhagegatan 4
S-214 59 Malmö / SE
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Onshage, Anders Christer, et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]Onshage, Anders Christer, et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
Former [2000/10]Onshage, Anders, et al
Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, IPR Department, Nya Vattentornet
221 83 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date98917849.603.04.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998SE00618
Priority number, dateSE1997000152121.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701521
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9848509
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983631
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983631
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H03F1/30, H03F1/52
[2000/10]
CPC:
H03F1/52 (EP,KR,US); H03F1/302 (KR); H03F3/21 (KR)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2000/10]
English:POWER AMPLIFIER AND METHOD THEREIN[2000/10]
French:AMPLIFICATION DE PUISSANCE ET PROCEDE UTILISE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE30.06.2004
FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
IT30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
PT30.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/32]BE30.06.2004
FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2006/13]BE30.06.2004
FI30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/23]BE30.06.2004
FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
ES11.10.2004
Former [2005/14]BE30.06.2004
FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2637270  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG);
 [X]FR2661053  (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]);
 [X]WO9531035  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.