EP0968369 - ROTODYNAMIC PUMP WITH NON-CIRCULAR HYDRODYNAMIC BEARING JOURNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states THE CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION 9500 Euclid Avenue-WB3 Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDING, Leonard, A., R. 37820 Jackson Road Moreland Hills, OH 44022 / US | 02 /
SMITH, William, A. 5223 Haverford Drive Lyndhurst, OH 44124 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98917955.1 | 17.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998US05220 | Priority number, date | US19970820756 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: US 820756 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841759 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968369 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968369 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04, F04D29/04, F04D13/06, A61M1/10 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
F04D29/047 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/221 (EP,US);
A61M60/422 (EP,US);
A61M60/824 (EP,US);
A61M60/825 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | F04B35/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2000/01] | Title | German: | ROTODYNAMISCHE PUMPE MIT NICHT-ZIRKULÄREM HYDRODYNAMISCHEN ACHSLAGER | [2000/01] | English: | ROTODYNAMIC PUMP WITH NON-CIRCULAR HYDRODYNAMIC BEARING JOURNAL | [2000/01] | French: | POMPE CENTRIFUGE A PALIER LISSE HYDRODYNAMIQUE NON CIRCULAIRE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 14.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB871001 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 15 * page 1, column 2, line 65 - page 2, column 1, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3201183 (ALFRED BUSKE) [Y] 16,17 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 14; figure 1 ** column 3, line 9 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [X]DE4123433 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11 * column 6, line 31 - line 43; figure 19 *; | [Y]WO9409274 (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [Y] 15-17 * page 6, line 31 - page 10, line 17; figures 3,7 * | International search | [A]US5324177 (GOLDING LEONARD A R [US], et al); | [A]US5370509 (GOLDING LEONARD A R [US], et al); | [XP]US5695471 (WAMPLER RICHARD K [US]); | [XP]US5713730 (NOSE YUKIHIKO [US], et al) |