EP0971864 - FLEXIBLE GRAPHITE COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCAR CARBON TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1521 Concord Pike, Suite 301, Brandywine West Building Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states UCAR CARBON TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1521 Concord Pike, Suite 301, Brandywine West Building Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | ||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states UCAR CARBON TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCURI, Robert, Angelo 1007 East Decker Drive Seven Hills, OH 44131 / US | 02 /
CAPP, Joseph, Paul 10094 Juniper Court Stongsville, OH 44136 / US | 03 /
GOUGH, Jeffrey, John 7321 Pondside Point Olmsted Township, OH 44138 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98917979.1 | 03.04.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998US06476 | Priority number, date | US19970833136 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 833136 | [2001/18] |
Former [2000/03] | US19970833356 | 04.04.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845224 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971864 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971864 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/536, F16J15/34 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
F16J15/3496 (EP);
C04B35/536 (EP,KR);
F16J15/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFF AUS FLEXIBLEM GRAPHIT | [2000/03] | English: | FLEXIBLE GRAPHITE COMPOSITE | [2000/03] | French: | COMPOSITE DE GRAPHITE FLEXIBLE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2002 | BE | 16.10.2002 | CH | 16.10.2002 | FI | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | LI | 16.10.2002 | NL | 16.10.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | CY | 03.04.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/44] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
CY | 03.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4007060 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3* column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 3; example 11; claims 1,3,5,9 * |