blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979061

EP0979061 - HAND-HELD HEARING SCREENER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETYMOTIC RESEARCH, INC
61 Martin Lane
Elk Grove Village, IL 60007 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ISEBERG, Steve
2545 Yarrow Lane
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98917989.002.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US06601
Priority number, dateUS1997083227703.04.1997         Original published format: US 832277
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843566
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979061
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979061
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/12, A61F11/00
[2000/26]
CPC:
A61B5/12 (EP,US); A61B5/6817 (EP,US); A61B2562/0219 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/07]A61F11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:HANDGERÄT ZUM ERKENNEN VON GEHÖRSCHÄDEN[2000/07]
English:HAND-HELD HEARING SCREENER APPARATUS[2000/07]
French:APPAREIL DE DEPISTAGE AUDITIF A MAIN[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Search fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
01.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2007
22.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2008Fee for grant paid
21.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04076052.2  / EP1437092
Opposition(s)19.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22]
Request for further processing for:22.08.2006Request for further processing filed
22.08.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.10.2006Decision despatched
01.03.2004Request for further processing filed
01.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
03.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
IT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
ES29.09.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2009/14]AT18.06.2008
BE18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
ES29.09.2008
Former [2009/09]AT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
ES29.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT18.06.2008
NL18.06.2008
Former [2008/50]AT18.06.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3320821  (EICHHOFF WERKE) [A] 1-20* abstract *;
 [A]US4687173  (GENNA ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
International search[A]US3295513  ;
 [Y]US3882848  (KLAR IRWIN, et al);
 [Y]US4057051  (KEROUAC ADRIAN R);
 [A]US4592370  (LEE JOHN J [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.