blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975218

EP0975218 - NUCLEOPHILE SUBSTITUTED ECTEINASCIDINS AND N-OXIDE ECTEINASCIDINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
349 Administration Building
University of Illinois
506 South Wright Street
Urbana
Illinois 61801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
349 Administration Building, University of Illinois, 506 South Wright Street
Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RINEHART, Kenneth, L.
454 Roger Adams Lab,600 South Matthew Avenue
Urbana, IL 61801-3792 / US
02 / ZHOU, Tong
45-5 RAL, 600 S. Mathews Ave.
Urbana, IL 61801 / US
[2000/31]
Former [2000/05]01 / RINEHART, Kenneth, L.
454 Roger Adams Lab,600 South Matthew Avenue
Urbana, IL 61801-3792 / US
02 / ZHOU, Tong-349 Administration Building
University of Illinois,508 South Wright Street
Urbana, IL 61801 / US
Representative(s)Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
Former [2004/01]Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB
Former [2000/05]Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98918132.614.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07340
Priority number, dateUS19970043596P15.04.1997         Original published format: US 43596 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846080
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975218
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/58, C07D317/08, C07D241/36, C07D291/08, C07D221/02, C07D515/22
[2001/37]
CPC:
C07D515/22 (EP,US); A01N43/58 (KR); A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D237/26 (KR); C07D241/36 (KR)
Former IPC [2001/18]A01N43/58, C07D317/08, C07D241/36, C07D291/08, C07D221/02
Former IPC [2000/05]A01N43/58, C07D237/26, C07D241/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:NUKLEOPHIL SUBSTITUIERTE ECTEINASCIDINE UND N-OXIDE VON ETEINASCIDINEN[2000/05]
English:NUCLEOPHILE SUBSTITUTED ECTEINASCIDINS AND N-OXIDE ECTEINASCIDINS[2000/05]
French:N-OXYDE ECTEINASCIDINES ET ECTEINASCIDINES A SUBSTITUTION NUCLEOPHILE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Search fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
21.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2006
21.03.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/34]
17.04.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/34]
27.04.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP06004129.0  / EP1668985
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5089273  (RINEHART KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 1,10,19 * example 8; claim 2; tables 1,2,4 *;
 [PX]WO9951238  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [PX] 1,10,19 * claim - *;
 [XD]  - R. SAKAI ET AL, "Ecteinascidins: Putative Biosynthetic precursors and absolute stereochemistry", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 9017 - 9023, XP002160918 [XD] 1,10,19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja950054m
International search[A]US4273773  (DEMERSON CHRISTOPHER A, et al);
 [A]US5459141  (VERTESY LASLO [DE], et al);
 [A]US5484717  (ZACCARDI JOSEPH A [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.