EP1007720 - DENDRITIC CELL HYBRIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC. 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02154 / US | [2008/10] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC. 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Jianlin 20 Winchester Street 7 Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 02 /
KUFE, Donald 179 Grove Street Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918140.9 | 15.04.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US07353 | Priority number, date | US19970043609P | 15.04.1997 Original published format: US 43609 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846785 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007720 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007720 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N5/08, C12N5/22, A61K39/00 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
C12N5/16 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/46447 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K2039/5152 (US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2239/38 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | C12P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | DENDRITISCHE ZELLHYBRIDE | [2000/24] | English: | DENDRITIC CELL HYBRIDS | [2000/24] | French: | HYBRIDES DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2007 | 03.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Request for further processing for: | 28.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2004 | Decision despatched | 23.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2008 | BE | 05.03.2008 | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | LU | 15.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 15.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, XP002167017 [X] 1-26 * abstract * | [ ] - ZHANG W ET AL, "In vivo induction of antitumor response by tumor cells fused with GM-CSF gene-modified dendritic cells", ZHONGHUA YI XUE ZA ZHI, (199701), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 39 - 42 | [X] - CELLUZZI CH M & FALO L D, "Immunization with dendritic cells fused with tumor cells elicits potent tumor specific immunity.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, Annual Meeting of the Society for Investigative Dermatology; Washington DC; 23-27 April 1997, (199704), vol. 108, no. 4, page 564, XP000993479 [X] 1-26 * abstract 157 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12292095 | [Y] - GUO YAJUN ET AL, "Effective tumor vaccine generated by fusion of hepatoma cells with activated B cells.", SCIENCE, (19940128), vol. 263, no. 5146, pages 518 - 520, XP002167016 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7507262 | [Y] - ZITVOGEL L ET AL, "Therapy of murine tumors with tumor peptide-pulsed dendritic cells: Dependence on T cells, B7 costimulation, and T helper cell 1-associated cytokines.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (199601), vol. 183, no. 1, pages 87 - 97, XP002910558 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.183.1.87 | International search | [AE]WO9817300 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [AP] - GONG J., ET AL., "INDUCTION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC ANTITUMOR IMMUNITY WITH ADENOVIRUS- TRANSDUCED DENDRITIC CELLS.", Gene Therapy, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB, (19971001), vol. 04., no. 10., doi:10.1038/sj.gt.3300496, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 1023 - 1028., XP002910552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300496 | [XP] - GONG J., ET AL., "INDUCTION OF ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY BY IMMUNIZATION WITH FUSIONS OF DENDRITIC AND CARCINOMA CELLS.", NATURE MEDICINE., NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19970501), vol. 03., no. 05., doi:10.1038/nm0597-558, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 558 - 561., XP002910553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0597-558 | [Y] - GIMMI C. D., ET AL., "BREAST CANCER-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN, DF3/MUC1, INDUCES APOPTOSIS OF ACTIVATED HUMAN T CELLS.", NATURE MEDICINE., NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19961201), vol. 02., no. 12., doi:10.1038/nm1296-1367, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1367 - 1370., XP002910554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1296-1367 | [X] - GONG J., ET AL., "INDUCTION OF ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY BY IMMUNIZATION WITH FUSION OF DENDRIC CELLS AND CARCINOMA CELLS.", Gene Therapy, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB, (19970301), vol. 38., ISSN 0969-7128, page 616., XP002910555 | [Y] - CHEN L., ET AL., "TRANSDUCTION OF HUMAN DENDRITIC CELLS WITH TUMOR ASSOCIATED ANTIGENGENES FOR THE GENERATION OF SPECIFIC CYTOTOXIC T IYMPHOCYTES.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 88TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. SAN DIEGO, APR. 12 - 16, 1997., PHILADELPHIA, AACR., US, US, (19970101), vol. 38., no. 11., page 11., XP002910556 | [XP] - GONG J. L., ET AL., "FUSION OF HUMAN BREAST TUMOR AND DENDRITIC CELLS AS A NOVEL ANTITUMOR VACCINE.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 89TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. NEW ORLEANS, LA, MARCH 28 - APRIL 1, 1998., PHILADELPHIA, PA : AACR., US, US, (19980301), vol. 39., page 172., XP002910557 | [Y] - YCH K.-Y., ET AL., "EXPRESSION OF B7-1 BY PAM 212 SQUAMOUS CELL CARCINOMA ENHANCES TUMOR CELL INTERACTIONS WITH DENDRITIC EPIDERMAL T CELLS BUT DOES NOT AFFECT IN VIVO TUMOR GROWTH.", Journal of Investigative Dermatology, Nature Publishing Group, US, US, (19970101), vol. 109., doi:10.1111/1523-1747.ep12340723, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 728 - 733., XP002910559 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12340723 | [XP] - GONJ J. L., ET AL., "REVERSAL OF CELL TOLERANCE BY IMMUNIZATION WITH FC/MUC1 DENDRITIC- CARCINOMA FUSIONS IN MUC1 TRANSGENIC MICE.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 89TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. NEW ORLEANS, LA, MARCH 28 - APRIL 1, 1998., PHILADELPHIA, PA : AACR., US, US, (19980301), vol. 39., page 263., XP002910560 | Examination | WO9817300 | - Moviglia: (1996) Transfus. Sci. 17, 643-649. | - ZHANG W. ET AL, "Translation of corresponding chinese document", ZHONGHUA YIXUE ZAZHI, (199701), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 39 - 42, XP009011468 | - JOHNSON ET AL, BR. J. CANCER, (2001), vol. 84, no. 10, pages 1424 - 1431 | - Cao et al: (1999) Immunology 97, 616-625. | - Gong et al: (1997) Gene Ther. 4, 1023-1028. | - Gong et al: W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY 3, 558-561. | - Gimmi et al: (1996) Nature Med. 2, 1360-1370. | - Gong et al: (1997) Proc. Am. Assoc. Cancer Res. 38, 616. | - Chen et al: (1997) Proc. Am. Assoc. Cancer Res. 38, 11. | - Gong et al: (1997) Proc. Am. Assoc. Cancer Res. 39, 172. | - Gong et al: (1997) Proc. Am. Assoc. Cancer Res. 39, 63. | - Yeh et al: (1997) J. Invest. Dermatol. 109, 728-733. | - Hart; Colaco: (1997) Nature 388, 626-627. |