EP0973475 - CURB-CLIMBING POWER WHEELCHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/04] | CURB-CLIMBING FRONT WHEEL DRIVE POWER WHEELCHAIR | ||
[2005/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pride Mobility Products, Corporation 182 Susquehanna Avenue Exeter, PA 18643 / US | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFNER, Walter, E. PO Box 44 Lehman, PA 18627 / US | 02 /
MULHERN, James, P. R.R. 2, Box 326 Hunlock Creek, PA 18621 / US | 03 /
ANTONISHAK, Stephen, J. 41 East Kirmar Avenue Alden, PA 18634 / US | 04 /
WHITE, Gerald, J. R.R. 2, Box 59A Hunlock Creek, PA 18621 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Ford, Timothy James, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Ford, Timothy James, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | White, Martin Paul, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918220.9 | 14.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US07543 | Priority number, date | US19970041973P | 15.04.1997 Original published format: US 41973 P | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846184 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973475 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973475 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/06, A61G5/04 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61G5/042 (EP);
A61G5/06 (EP);
A61G5/1089 (EP);
A61G2203/14 (EP);
A61G2203/723 (EP);
A61G5/1075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/16] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EIN ÜBER BORDSTEINKANTEN FAHRBARER ROLLSTUHL | [2005/16] | English: | CURB-CLIMBING POWER WHEELCHAIR | [2005/16] | French: | FAUTEUIL ROULANT MOTORISE CAPABLE DE MONTER SUR DES BORDURES DE TROTTOIR | [2005/16] |
Former [2000/04] | EIN ÜBER BORDSTEINKANTEN ALLRADANGETRIEBENER, FAHRENDER ROLLSTUHL | ||
Former [2000/04] | CURB-CLIMBING FRONT WHEEL DRIVE POWER WHEELCHAIR | ||
Former [2000/04] | FAUTEUIL ROULANT MOTORISE A TRACTION AVANT ET CAPABLE DE MONTER SUR DES BORDURES DE TROTTOIR | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2005 | BE | 06.07.2005 | CH | 06.07.2005 | CY | 06.07.2005 | FI | 06.07.2005 | LI | 06.07.2005 | NL | 06.07.2005 | DK | 06.10.2005 | GR | 06.10.2005 | SE | 06.10.2005 | DE | 07.10.2005 | ES | 17.10.2005 | PT | 12.12.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/36] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
BE | 06.07.2005 | ||
CH | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
LI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
DE | 07.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
BE | 06.07.2005 | ||
CH | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
LI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
BE | 06.07.2005 | ||
CH | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
LI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
CH | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
LI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
CH | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
LI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2399822 (DUPONT LIT SA [FR]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2265868 (LONG SHINE ENTERPRISE CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO9615752 (DEGONDA REHAB SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 7, line 21 - page 13, line 8 * * page 14, line 19 - page 19, line 6; figures 1-8,12-15 * | by applicant | US3953054 | US4387325 | US4513832 | US4538857 | US5094310 | US5145020 | US5366037 | US5540297 |