EP0914633 - GENERATION ISOLATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GARBAGE COLLECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2008/20] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL01-521 Palo Alto, California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'CONNOR, James, Michael 345 Ruth Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
TREMBLAY, Marc Apartment 3 801 Waverly Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
VISHIN, Sanjay Apartment 89 1055 Manet Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [1999/19] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918272.0 | 21.04.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998US07622 | Priority number, date | US19970841543 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: US 841543 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848351 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914633 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914633 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
G06F12/0276 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99957 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ISOLIERUNG DURCH ERZEUGUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR GARBAGE-SAMMLUNG | [1999/19] | English: | GENERATION ISOLATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GARBAGE COLLECTION | [1999/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ISOLEMENT PAR GENERATION MIS EN OEUVRE POUR RECUPERER DES POSITIONS LIBRES | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | [2010/19] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0113460 (SYMBOLICS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9,12,13,18,25,28,33 * page 52, line 1 - line 29 *; | [A]US4797810 (MCENTEE TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,25,33* column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 37; figure 3 *; | [A]US4807120 (COURTS HOWARD R [US]) [A] 1-9,12-14,25-27,33,36 * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 8; figures 3,4 *; | [A] - HOSKING A L ET AL, "A COMPARATIVE PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF WRITE BARRIER IMPLEMENTATIONS", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, (19921001), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 92 - 109, XP000327291 [A] 1,2,4,7,8,10,15,18,20,21,24-27,31,33,34,36 * page 96, column L, paragraph 3.1.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/141937.141946 | [DA] - JONES ET AL., Garbage collection: Algorithms for automatic dynamic memory management, CHICHESTER, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1996), XP002071467 [DA] 1,7,8,18-22,25,33 * page 165 - page 173 * | by applicant | US4807120 | - JONES; LINS, Garbage Collection: Algorithms for A utomatic Dynamic Memory Management, WILEY, (1996), pages 169 - 70 | - MOON, "Architecture of the Symbolics 3600", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, (1985), pages 76 - 83 | - WILSON; MOHER, "Design of the Opportunistic Garbage Collector", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, (1989), vol. 24, no. 10, pages 23 - 35 | - HOSKINS A L, "A Comparative Performance Evaluation of Write Barrier Implementations", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, (19921001), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 92 - 109 |