blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976127

EP0976127 - ADJUSTABLE HEAD LOADING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seagate Technology LLC
920 Disc Drive
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY, INC.
920 Disc Drive
Scotts Valley, California 95066-4544 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HO, Bin-Lun
231 Mistletoe Road
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
02 / RAO, Vinod, K.
43873 Cameron Hills Drive
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Former [2002/40]Käck, Jürgen, et al
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2000/05]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date98918346.217.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07749
Priority number, dateUS19970044621P18.04.1997         Original published format: US 44621 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9848411
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976127
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G11B5/54, G11B21/12, G11B21/21, G11B5/60
[2000/05]
CPC:
G11B5/6005 (EP,US); G11B21/22 (EP,US); G11B5/54 (EP,US);
G11B5/55 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARE KOPFLADEVORRICHTUNG[2000/05]
English:ADJUSTABLE HEAD LOADING APPARATUS[2000/05]
French:APPAREIL DE CHARGEMENT DE TETES AJUSTABLE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase18.11.1999National basic fee paid 
18.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2004Fee for grant paid
11.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
15.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5148339  (YOSHIDA KOBUN [JP]) [Y] 1-6,9-14,18-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 32 - line 45 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 61 * [A] 7,8,15-17;
 [A]WO9636045  (IOMEGA CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 7, line 30 - page 13, line 5 *;
 [YA]US5289325  (MOREHOUSE JAMES H [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,9-13,18-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 44 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 63 * * column 7, line 11 - line 57 * [A] 7,8,14-17;
 [A]EP0658882  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 8, line 10 - column 10, line 49 * * column 16, line 1 - line 8 *
 [Y]  - "SLIDER LOAD/UNLOAD RAMP FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING FILES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19950601), vol. 38, no. 6, page 87/88, XP000520591 [Y] 1-6,9-14,18-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "LOW PROFILE MECHANISM FOR HEAD LOAD/UNLOAD", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940901), vol. 37, no. 9, page 615/616, XP000473527 [Y] 1-6,9-13,18-20 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.