24.02.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.05.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.08.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
24.04.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.08.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.04.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] |
15.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
22.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.03.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
15.08.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] |
09.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.12.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
28.12.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
09.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
23.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
17.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|