Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7151298 | Global Dossier | 13.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US4421997 | 23.04.1997 | US9808176 | 23.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0977650 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2003 | A4 | EP0977650 | 09.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4421997 | 23.04.1997 | US9808176 | 23.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2287425 | 08.04.2008 | C | CA2287425 | 29.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4421997 | 23.04.1997 | US9808176 | 23.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6108893 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US4421997 | 23.04.1997 | US6537198 | 23.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9848177 | Global Dossier | 11.02.1999 | A3 | WO9848177 | 29.10.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4421997 | 23.04.1997 |