EP0979437 - IMAGING MEDIUM COMPRISING POLYCARBONATE, METHOD OF MAKING, METHOD OF IMAGING, AND IMAGE-BEARING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OU-YANG, David, T. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918634.1 | 23.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US08197 | Priority number, date | US19970846398 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 846398 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849605 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979437 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979437 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G7/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
G03G7/004 (EP,US);
G03G7/002 (EP,US);
G03G7/0086 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/07] | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATE ENTHALTENDES BILDHERSTELLUNGSMEDIUM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES MEDIUMS, BILDHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, UND EIN BILD TRAGENDES MEDIUM | [2000/07] | English: | IMAGING MEDIUM COMPRISING POLYCARBONATE, METHOD OF MAKING, METHOD OF IMAGING, AND IMAGE-BEARING MEDIUM | [2000/07] | French: | SUPPORT DE FORMATION D'IMAGE COMPORTANT DU POLYCARBONATE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, TECHNIQUE DE FORMATION D'IMAGE ET SUPPORT PORTEUR D'IMAGE | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.03.2002 | IT | 13.03.2002 | GB | 13.06.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 13.03.2002 | |
GB | 13.06.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 13.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3949148 (AKMAN ALPTEKIN) [A] 1 * examples 1-3; claim 3 *; | [A]US5545459 (CHANG JOHN C H [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - line 46; example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5504129 (DANDREAUX GARY F [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1-8; claim 6 *; | [A]EP0506109 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 9 - line 10; claim 1 * |