EP1014838 - DISPLAY BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, Wisconsin 53403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUELSON, Leon, C. 4600 Pierce Boulevard Racine, WI 53405 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing. Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918645.7 | 24.04.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US08217 | Priority number, date | US19970848514 | 28.04.1997 Original published format: US 848514 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848676 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014838 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014838 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/11, B65D5/72 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A47F5/112 (EP,US);
B65D5/724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | AUSSTELLUNGSBEHÄLTER | [2000/27] | English: | DISPLAY BOX | [2000/27] | French: | BOITE-PRESENTOIR | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.11.2001 | CH | 07.11.2001 | FI | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | NL | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | IE | 24.04.2002 | LU | 24.04.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002493 (EINSON MORRIS M) [A] 1,7 * figure - *; | [XA]US2011410 (JONES MONTGOMERY O) [X] 1-3,6 * page 1, column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 47; figure - * [A] 4,5,7; | [A]US2249430 (LAMBERT RUSSELL A) [A] 1,7 * page 1, column 1, line 28 - page 1, column 2, line 55; figure - *; | [A]US3450308 (SCHOENEFELD WILLIAM C) [A] 1,7* figures 3,6 *; | [A]US3494479 (MARTIN DARYL T) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 5; figure - *; | [A]US5301800 (KENNEY RICHARD E H [CA]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | USD191143S | USD200180S | US820542 | US1732436 |