EP0979098 - METHOD OF TREATING HYPERPROLACTINEMIA AND PROLACTINOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES S.A.S. 51-53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverley Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | ||
For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES S.A.S. 51-53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverley Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | ||
For all designated states Biomeasure Incorporated 27 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757-3650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELMED, Shlomo 9437 Cresta Drive Los Angeles, CA 90035 / US | 02 /
SHIMON, Ilan 221 S. Gale Drive 302 Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US | 03 /
CULLER, Michael, D. 17 Ledgestone Drive Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al Marks & Clerk, 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | ||
Former [2000/07] | Ritthaler, Wolfgang, Dr., et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Kindermann Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918696.0 | 24.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US08288 | Priority number, date | US19970045241P | 01.05.1997 Original published format: US 45241 P | US19970852221 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: US 852221 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850063 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979098 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979098 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/31, // (A61K38/31, 31:48, A61P35:00) | [2002/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/31 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/31, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/31, A61K31/48 (EP) |
Former IPC [2000/07] | A61K38/31, // (A61K38/31, 31:48) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERPROLAKTINÄMIA UND PROLAKTINOMEN | [2000/07] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING HYPERPROLACTINEMIA AND PROLACTINOMAS | [2000/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERPROLACTINEMIE ET DES PROLACTINOMES | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03005548.7 / EP1332762 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2000 | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.03.2003 | CY | 24.04.2003 | LU | 24.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
CY | 24.04.2003 | ||
LU | 24.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
LU | 24.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 12.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0203031 (UNIV TULANE [US]) [A] 1-42 * page 2, column 2, line 47 - line 51; claim - * * page 55, column 20, line 11 - line 23 * * page 13, column 22, line 3 - line 6 *; | [D]US4650787 (SCHALLY ANDREW V [US], et al); | [D]US4725577 (SCHALLY ANDREW V [US], et al); | [A]WO9711962 (BIOMEASURE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 35; claim 21 *; | [DA] - I. SHIMON ET AL., "SOMATOSTATIN RECEPTOR SUBTYPE SPECIFICITY IN HUMAN FETAL PITUITARY CULTURES: DIFFERENTIAL ROLE OF SSTR2 AND SSTR5 FOR GROWTH HORMONE, THYROID-STIMULATING HORMONE, AND PROLACTIN REGULATION.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, N.Y., US, (19970215), vol. 99, no. 4, pages 789 - 798, XP002073099 [DA] 1-42 * page 794, column R, paragraph 2 - page 795, column L, paragraph 1; figures 2B,4; table I * * page 797, column L, line 8 - line 13 * * page 795, column L, line 29 - column R, line 6 * * page 796, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119225 | [PX] - I. SHIMON ET AL., "SOMATOSTATIN RECEPTOR (SSTR) SUBTYPE-SELECTIVE ANALOGUES DIFFERENTIALLY SUPRESS IN VITRO GROWTH HORMONE AND PROLACTIN IN HUMAN PITUITARY ADENOMAS: NOVEL POTENTIAL THERAPY FOR FUNCTIONAL PITUITARY TUMORS.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, N.Y., US, (19971101), vol. 100, no. 9, pages 2386 - 2392, XP002073100 [PX] 1-10,24-36 * page 2389, column L, paragraph 2 - page 2390, column L, line 10; figure 3; table I * * page 2391, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119779 |