EP0979216 - HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX GLASSES, MULTIFOCAL CORRECTIVE LENSES CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning S.A. 44 avenue de Valvins, B.P. No. 61 77211 Avon Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Corning S.A. 44 avenue de Valvins, B.P. No. 61 77211 Avon Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMTE, Marie 44, rue Boris Vilde F-92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 02 /
MARQUES, Paulo 19, rue de l'Avenir F-91550 Paray Vieille Poste / FR | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/07] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918736.4 | 27.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US08352 | Priority number, date | FR19970005357 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9705357 | US19970051538 | 02.07.1997 Original published format: US 51538 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849110 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979216 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979216 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/07, C03C3/072, G02C7/06 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C03C3/074 (EP,US);
C03C3/07 (EP,US);
C03C3/072 (EP,US);
Y10S501/903 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | C03C3/064, C03C3/066, C03C3/068, C03C3/07, C03C3/072, C03C3/074, G02C7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/07] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE GLÄSER MIT HOHEM BRECHUNGSINDEX UND MULTIFOKALE KORREKTURLINSEN AUS DIESEN GLÄSER | [2002/44] | English: | HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX GLASSES, MULTIFOCAL CORRECTIVE LENSES CONTAINING SAME | [2000/07] | French: | VERRES OPHTALMIQUES A INDICE DE REFRACTION ELEVE, LENTILLES CORRECTRICES MULTIFOCALES COMPRENANT CES VERRES | [2000/07] |
Former [2000/07] | OPHTALMISCHE GLÄSER MIT HOHEM BRECHUNGSINDEX UND MULTFOHLE KORREHTURLINSE AUS DIESEN GLÄSER | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 10.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.06.2003 | DE | 11.08.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/05] | DE | 11.08.2003 | |
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | ES | 22.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2099417 (ZEISS STIFTUNG) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,2 *; | JPH07784211 [ ] (OHARA OPTICAL GLASS MFG. LTD.); | JPH07573914 [ ] (HOYA GLASS WORKS LTD.); | JPS60221338 [ ] (OHARA KK); | [A]DE3002935 (SAALE GLAS GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2; claim - * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780220), vol. 88, no. 8, Database accession no. 54200a, XP002053209 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760322), vol. 84, no. 12, Database accession no. 78604d, page 306, XP002053210 [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860421), vol. 104, no. 16, Database accession no. 134742t, page 299, XP002053211 [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4149896 (FAULSTICH MARGA, et al); | [A]US5548353 (KASSNER REINHARD [DE]); | [A]US4562162 (SAGARA HIROJI [JP]); | [A]US4507393 (KASSNER REINHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US4351906 (BOUDOT JEAN E, et al); | [A]US4211569 (HARES GEORGE B [US], et al); | [A]US3915723 (UPTON LEE O) |