EP0985094 - ADJUSTABLE STOP FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vickers Incorporated 3000 Strayer, PO Box 50 Maumee, Ohio 43537-0050 / US | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOONE, Nick, L. 17127 L. Street Omaha, NE 68135 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schwan Möbus Wiese, Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918749.7 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998US08380 | Priority number, date | US19970864246 | 28.05.1997 Original published format: US 864246 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854466 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985094 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985094 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/32 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
F04B1/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE ARRETIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR TAUMELSCHEIBENPUMPEN MIT VARIABLER FÖRDERMENGE | [2000/11] | English: | ADJUSTABLE STOP FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT PUMPS | [2000/11] | French: | BUTEE REGLABLE POUR POMPES A CYLINDREE VARIABLE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2002 | BE | 23.10.2002 | CH | 23.10.2002 | FI | 23.10.2002 | GR | 23.10.2002 | LI | 23.10.2002 | NL | 23.10.2002 | DK | 23.01.2003 | PT | 23.01.2003 | SE | 23.01.2003 | CY | 22.04.2003 | IE | 22.04.2003 | LU | 22.04.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
CY | 22.04.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
CY | 22.04.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
BE | 23.10.2002 | ||
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 23.10.2002 | |
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 23.01.2003 | |
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 23.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB185295 (ARTHUR BOLLINCKX) [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 3, line 39 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [XA]US2071672 (PRESTON WHITCOMB) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 34 * * figure 3 * [A] 2-7,9-14; | [X]FR1314483 (JOHANNES FRERES SA) [X] 1,5-8,12-14 * page 2, line 8 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [XA]BE696270 (SA G. DUMONT & FRÈRES) [X] 1-4,8 * page 7; figure 1 * [A] 5-7,9-14; | [XA]USRE26519E (D'AMATO, MICHAEL A.) [X] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *[A] 2-7,9-14 |