EP0983228 - PROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONDINELL, William, Edward 1512 Franklin Lane Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 02 /
DesJARLAIS, Renee, Louise 11 Cornwall Circle St. Davids, PA 19087 / US | 03 /
VEBER, Daniel, Frank 290 Batleson Road Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Dennis, Shinji 703 Edgewood Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Rutter, Keith, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Rutter, Keith, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918878.4 | 30.04.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US08764 | Priority number, date | US19970046862P | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 46862 P | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850342 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983228 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07C233/00 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C233/40 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C311/18 (EP,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D215/36 (EP,US);
C07D215/48 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Extension states | SI | 17.11.1999 | Title | German: | PROTEASEINHIBITOREN | [2000/10] | English: | PROTEASE INHIBITORS | [2000/10] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PROTEASES | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/44] | Request for further processing for: | 06.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0181071 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,17,39,42,44 * examples 1-23; claims 1,15 *; | [X]DE3542567 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,17,39,42,44 * examples 1-27; claims 1,22 *; | [X]EP0190891 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [X] 39 * abstract *; | [X]US4640911 (BASCHANG GERHARD [CH], et al) [X] 39,41 * column A; examples 1,2,9,15-19,21,24,25,29-31 *; | [X]EP0223437 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 39,42-44 * examples 1-36; claims 1,11 *; | [X]DE3643977 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 39,43,44 * examples 1-29; claims 1,21 *; | [X]DE3800591 (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [X] 39 * abstract *; | [X]WO9009191 (SCHRAMM WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 39,43 * abstract ** page 21, line 10 - line 23 *; | [DX]EP0525420 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [DX] 1,4,17,46,47,49,50 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - line 18 * * tab.1: cpd.197-199,461-484 * * examples 190,191 *; | [DA]EP0603873 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1,17 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - line 19 * * tab.1: cpd. 359,360,381-383,391,417 *; | [X]WO9524385 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 39,44,45 * abstract * * tab.1: cpd.1027 *; | [X]WO9628465 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 39,42 * abstract * * tables 3A-E,4A-D,5A-D,7A-F,8A-F,9A-F *; | [X]US5559256 (GORDON ERIC M [US], et al) [X] 39,42 * column A; claim 1 * * examples 38,41,53-56,62,66-73,77-105,111-121,125,133,134 * * examples 141,171,202-205,211,212,219-225,234,243-250 * * examples 254-265,280-288,297,311,315,320-328,340-342,351 * * examples 352,359,373,374,383 *; | [X]US5585397 (TUNG ROGER D [US]) [X] 39,42 * column A; claim 1; tables I-V *; | [PX]WO9716433 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-14,17,39,41-55 * claims 1,20,26,37,63-72 * * examples 37-61,210-291 *; | [X] - MOREE ET AL, "Exploitation of Subtilisin BPN' as Catalyst for the Synthesis o Peptides Containing Noncoded Amino Acids, Peptide Mimetics and Peptide Conjugates", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970430), vol. 119, no. 17, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3942 - 3947, XP002107597 [X] 39,41,45 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja964399w | [X] - STEPINSKI J ET AL, "NEW DIMERIC TETRAPEPTIDE ENKEPHALIN ANALOGUES HYDROPHILIC SPACER LENGTH AND CONFIGURATION AFFECTS POTENCY AND RECEPTOR SELECTIVITY", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR NATURFORSCHUNG, TEIL B: ANORGANISCHE CHEMIE, ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, VERLAG DER ZEITSCHRIFT FUR NATURFORSCHUNG. TUBINGEN, DE, (1994), vol. 49, no. 3, ISSN 0932-0776, pages 407 - 411, XP001053394 [X] 39,41,43,44 * abstract * | [X] - JACOBSON A R ET AL, "MINIMUM-STRUCTURE ENKEPHALIN ANALOGUES INCORPORATING L-TYROSINE, D(OR L)-PHENYLALANINE, AND A DIAMINE SPACER", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1989), vol. 32, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1708 - 1717, XP001053393 [X] 39,41,43,44 * abstract * * scheme 4: cpd.7a,b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00128a007 | [X] - NATARAJAN S ET AL, "TRIPEPTIDE AMINOALCOHOLS: A NEW CLASS OF HUMAN RENIN INHIBITORS", PEPTIDES: CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, XX, XX, (1987), pages 131 - 133, XP008000424 [X] 39 * the whole document * | [X] - LULY J R ET AL, "NEW INHIBITORS OF HUMAN RENIN THAT CONTAIN NOVEL LEU-VAL REPLACEMENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1987), vol. 30, no. 9, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1609 - 1616, XP001053395 [X] 39 * abstract * * tab.II: cpd.34,37,47 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00392a015 | [X] - ROSENBERG S H ET AL, "NOVEL RENIN INHIBITORS CONTAINING ANALOGUES OF STATINE RETRO-INVERTED AT THE C-TERMIN: SPECIFICITY AT THE P2 HISTIDINE SITE1,2", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19870701), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1224 - 1228, XP002027217 [X] 39 * page 1224 - page 1225 * * tab.I: cpd.16-18,30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00390a018 | [X] - DANN, J.G. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1986), vol. 134, no. 1, pages 71 - 77, XP001040319 [X] 39,42,43 * page 71 - page 74; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(86)90528-0 | International search | [A]US4638010 (WELLER III HAROLD N [US], et al); | [A]US4749792 (NATARAJAN SESHA I [US], et al) |