Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0202909 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60956800 | 30.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU730204B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2001 | B2 | AU7174398 | 27.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7166001 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US60956800 | 30.06.2000 | US0120799 | 29.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0980464 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2004 | B1 | EP0980464 | 23.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP1240 | 30.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE257903T | 15.01.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9809219 | 04.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2289269 | 01.08.2006 | C | CA2289269 | 12.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2430662 | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60956800 | 30.06.2000 | US0120799 | 29.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69821104T | 11.11.2004 | T2 | DE69821104D1 | 19.02.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9808891 | 01.05.1998 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6086159 | 11.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | US28788599 | 07.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6505892 | 14.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US60956800 | 30.06.2000 | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | US28788599 | 07.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9850682 | Global Dossier | 12.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID23782A | 11.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US85168097 | 06.05.1997 |