EP0980464 - SOFTWALL MINING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMC-AGRICO Company Suite E-200, 2345 Waukegan Road Bannockburn, IL 60015-5516 / US | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSON, Randall, D. 11602 Colchester Drive Sandy, UT 84092 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Phillips, Patricia Marie, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98918915.4 | 01.05.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998US08891 | Priority number, date | US19970851680 | 06.05.1997 Original published format: US 851680 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850682 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980464 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980464 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21C41/16, E21C25/60 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
E21C41/16 (EP,US);
E21C25/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | BERGBAUVORRICHTUNG- UND VERFAHREN FÜR UNTERIRDISCHE WEICHE WÄNDE | [2000/08] | English: | SOFTWALL MINING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2000/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPLOITATION MINIERE POUR FORMATIONS A PAROIS TENDRES | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | CH | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | FR | 14.01.2004 | IT | 14.01.2004 | LI | 14.01.2004 | NL | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | LU | 01.05.2004 | IE | 04.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
FR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
FR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 01.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3790214 (KILROY O) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]DE2307413 (RHEINSTAHL AG [DE]) [A] 1,9* figure -; claim 1 *; | [A] - NASA, "automated coal-mining system", N.T.I.S. TECH. NOTES, VIRGINIA, USA, (198601), pages 71 - 72, XP002068425 [A] 1-5,7,9-15 | by applicant | US4017122 |