blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973989

EP0973989 - GUIDE RUNNER FOR DOOR DRIVE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MARANTEC Antriebs- und Steuerungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Remser Brook 11
33428 Marienfeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
MARANTEC Antriebs- und Steuerungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Remser Brook 11
33428 Marienfeld / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MARANTEC ANTRIEBS- UND STEUERUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO., PRODUKTIONS OHG
Remser Brook 11
33428 Marienfeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HÖRMANN, Michael
Bokeler Strasse 22
D-33790 Halle / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98919127.523.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01676
Priority number, dateDE1997206904U16.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29706904 U
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846848
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973989
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973989
Date:20.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:E05F15/16
[2000/04]
CPC:
E05F15/643 (EP,US); E05Y2201/214 (EP); E05Y2201/604 (EP);
E05Y2201/64 (EP); E05Y2201/708 (EP); E05Y2600/528 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSSCHLITTEN FÜR EINEN TORANTRIEB[2000/04]
English:GUIDE RUNNER FOR DOOR DRIVE MECHANISM[2000/04]
French:COULISSEAU DE GUIDAGE POUR ENTRAINEMENT DE PORTE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
07.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2004Fee for grant paid
20.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
SE20.01.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2005/46]IE20.10.2004
DK20.01.2005
GR20.01.2005
Former [2005/26]GR20.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE8506669U  (DÖRING) [Y] 3,4 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * [A] 5,6;
 [XY]DE8710940U  (BERNER) [X] 1 * page 7, line 6 - line 21 * * page 8, line 4 - line 6; figures 2,3,5 * [Y] 3,4;
 [A]US5222403  (ANGELINI THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 3-6 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 1 ** column 6, line 11 - line 26; figures 1-7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.