EP0974020 - THROTTLE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnoplastic SPA Via Fontanelle 22, Loc. Sarissola 16012 Busalla / IT | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUBARO, Bruno Via N. Gallino, 34/2 I-16010 Savignone / IT | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Weiss, Wolfgang c/o Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2000/04] | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro, Dipl.-Phys. Via Pecorile 27/B 17015 Celle Ligure (Savona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 98919223.2 | 06.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP01995 | Priority number, date | IT1997SV00018 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: IT SV970018 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846918 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974020 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974020 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/228, F16K27/02, F16K31/53 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
F16K31/535 (EP);
F16K1/2285 (EP);
F16K27/0218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | DROSSELVENTIL | [2000/04] | English: | THROTTLE VALVE | [2000/04] | French: | ROBINET D'ETRANGLEMENT | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | BE | 26.11.2003 | CH | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | LI | 26.11.2003 | NL | 26.11.2003 | DK | 26.02.2004 | GR | 26.02.2004 | SE | 26.02.2004 | IE | 06.04.2004 | LU | 06.04.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
IE | 06.04.2004 | ||
LU | 06.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
IE | 06.04.2004 | ||
LU | 06.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 06.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
BE | 26.11.2003 | ||
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | |
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 26.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1552564 (FMC CORPORATION) [A] 19 * figure 5 *; | [XY]DE2231277 (JAMESBURY CORP) [X] 1-11 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 12-15,18; | [Y]FR2357797 (DELBERGUE MARTIAL [FR]) [Y] 18 * figure 1 *; | [X]US4138090 (SUMNER JOE D, et al) [X] 1 * figure 10 *; | [X]FR2423696 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [Y]GB2069103 (FIP FORMATURA INIENZIONE POLI) [Y] 12,13 * figures 3-5 *; | [X]US4289296 (KRAUSE BERND) [X] 1-11 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US4304392 (MACIULAITIS VYTAUTAS K) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]GB2090380 (MASONEILAN INT INC) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE8513613U (MÜLLER) [A] 18 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0166286 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1 * figures 6,11 *; | [Y]EP0379615 (VIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14,15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0390458 (TOMOE TECH RES CO [JP]) [Y] 18 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE4217448 (MUELLER VERPACKUNGEN [CH]) [A] 19 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE9421290U (SCHMITZ & SCHULTE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 19 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9622482 (KOHLER CO [US]) |