EP0979597 - TRAFFIC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signal House Limited CherryCourt Way, Stanbridge Road, Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 8UH / GB | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARFIELD, George, Joseph 100 Harcourt Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 3QL / GB | 02 /
WAREING, James, Ian 7 Carriers Way Carlton, Bedfordshire MK43 7LN / GB | 03 /
ROBINSON, Max North House, High house, Snaizeholme Hawes, North Yorkshire DL8 3ND / GB | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Howe, Steven, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98919333.9 | 29.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998GB01242 | Priority number, date | GB19970008861 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9708861 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849872 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979597 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979597 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, F21S4/00, B61L5/18 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
B61L5/1836 (EP,US);
B61L5/1881 (EP);
G08G1/095 (EP);
H05B45/10 (EP);
H05B45/30 (EP,US);
H05B45/395 (EP,US);
H05B45/58 (EP);
H05B47/22 (EP,US);
B61L2207/02 (EP);
Y02B20/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | H05B33/08, F21Q3/00, B61L5/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | VERKEHRSLICHTSIGNAL | [2000/07] | English: | TRAFFIC SIGNALS | [2000/07] | French: | FEUX DE SIGNALISATION | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.07.2002 | BE | 24.07.2002 | FI | 24.07.2002 | GR | 24.07.2002 | DK | 24.10.2002 | PT | 24.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2005/21] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 24.07.2002 | |
PT | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2426381 (BOURBOULON HENRI [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 20; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4182977 (STRICKLIN ROBERT S JR [US]) [A] 6,7 * column 1, line 10 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB1574387 (BOURBOULON H) [A] 1,8,10 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 78; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2586844 (SOFRELA SA [FR]) [Y] 12,15,16 * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 2; figures 1-10 *; | [A]FR2631102 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]GB2226875 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 20 * figures 3-14 *; | [Y]DE4305585 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 17,19,20 * page 2, line 43 - page 5, line 50; figures 1-7 *; | [X]FR2711884 (SOLARTEC SARL [FR]) [X] 1,6,8,9,11 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]WO9512512 (SIEMENS INTEGRA VERKEHRSTECHNI [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11 * page 2, line 14 - page 6, line 27; figures 1-3 * [Y] 12,15-17,19,20; | [A]FR2724749 (SOFRELA SA [FR]) |