blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0982385

EP0982385 - ADHESIVE, METHOD FOR BONDING, AND ASSEMBLIES OF MOUNTED BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / DATE, Hiroaki Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka
4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / MOTOYAMA, Yuko Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / TOKUHIRA, Hidesi Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / USUI, Makoto Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
05 / IMAIZUMI, Nobuhiro Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98919557.311.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998JP02082
Priority number, dateJP1997012058712.05.1997         Original published format: JP 12058797
JP1997034324912.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34324997
[2000/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9851756
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982385
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982385
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:C09J163/00, C09J4/02, C09J5/04, C09J5/06, H01B1/20, H01L21/52
[2000/09]
CPC:
H01L24/28 (EP,US); H01L21/563 (EP,US); H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US); H01L24/92 (EP,US); H05K3/323 (EP);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US); H01L2224/05573 (EP,US); H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US); H01L2224/2929 (EP,US); H01L2224/29339 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29344 (EP,US); H01L2224/29347 (EP,US); H01L2224/29355 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29364 (EP,US); H01L2224/29373 (EP,US); H01L2224/29386 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2949 (EP,US); H01L2224/73104 (EP,US); H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81193 (EP,US); H01L2224/81801 (EP,US); H01L2224/83097 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83099 (EP,US); H01L2224/83193 (EP,US); H01L2224/83201 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83851 (EP,US); H01L2224/83855 (EP,US); H01L2224/83862 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US); H01L24/81 (EP,US); H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US); H01L2924/01006 (EP,US); H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US); H01L2924/0102 (EP,US); H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01025 (EP,US); H01L2924/01027 (EP,US); H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US); H01L2924/01045 (EP,US); H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US); H01L2924/01079 (EP,US); H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US); H01L2924/07811 (EP,US); H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US); H05K2201/10984 (EP); H05K3/303 (EP,US);
H05K3/386 (EP,US); Y10T156/1011 (EP,US); Y10T156/1018 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1026 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2224/29339, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29344, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29347, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29355, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29364, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29373, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83201, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/351, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
(-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/09]
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFF, VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG UND ANORDUNGEN VON MONTIERTEN LEITERPLATTEN[2000/09]
English:ADHESIVE, METHOD FOR BONDING, AND ASSEMBLIES OF MOUNTED BOARDS[2000/09]
French:ADHESIF, PROCEDE DE COLLAGE ET ASSEMBLAGES DE PANNEAUX MONTES[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999Translation filed 
06.12.1999National basic fee paid 
06.12.1999Search fee paid 
06.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
06.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
15.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2003Fee for grant paid
20.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]SU429658  ;
 [A]JPH05306379  ;
 [A]JPS5548209  ;
 [X]EP0218364  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US5043102  (CHEN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 28, Database accession no. 1980-49184C, XP002172070 & SU429658 A 19800225 (MECH ENG DES TECHN) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940224), vol. 018, no. 114, Database accession no. (C - 1171), & JP05306379 A 19931119 (KONISHI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 20, Database accession no. 1980-35681C, XP002172071 & JPS5548209 A 19800405 (TOA GOSEI CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH04100878  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH05321920  (THREE BOND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0688040  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]JPH06322350  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]JPH07252460  (FUJITSU LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.