EP0980289 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBOXYLIC ACID SALTS AND CATALYSTS USEFUL IN SUCH PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology LLC 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [2001/29] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBNER, Jerry, R. 233 Bentwood Lane St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 02 /
FRANCZYK, Thaddeus, S. 12235 Spring Place Court Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2000/08] | Bosch, Henry A., et al Monsanto Services International S.A., Patent Department, Avenue de Tervuren 270/272, Letter Box No. 21 1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 98919707.4 | 05.05.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998US03189 | Priority number, date | US19970841888 | 05.05.1997 Original published format: US 841888 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850150 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980289 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980289 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/89, B01J37/02 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
C07C227/02 (EP,US);
B01J23/89 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
B01J37/0217 (EP,US);
C07C51/41 (EP,US);
C07F9/3813 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/41, C07C59/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONSÄURE-SALZE UND KATALYSATOREN VERWENDBAR FÜR SOLCHES VERFAHREN | [2000/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBOXYLIC ACID SALTS AND CATALYSTS USEFUL IN SUCH PROCESS | [2000/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SELS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE ET CATALYSEURS DE REALISATION DE CE PROCEDE | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | CH | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | LI | 26.11.2003 | NL | 26.11.2003 | GR | 26.02.2004 | SE | 26.02.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | IE | 05.05.2004 | LU | 05.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
IE | 05.05.2004 | ||
LU | 05.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 05.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CH | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
LI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | |
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 26.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06110250 ; | [A]JPH067679 ; | [Y]EP0305089 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-36 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9601146 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 1-36 *see entire document* | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940720), vol. 018, no. 387, Database accession no. (P - 1773), & JP06110250 A 19940422 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940413), vol. 018, no. 209, Database accession no. (C - 1190), & JP06007679 A 19940118 (TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * | Examination | EP0335625 |