EP0971847 - PATCH BAG HAVING SEAL THROUGH PATCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan South Carolina 29334 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOAL, Dilip, K. 6 Hunters Trail Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
CHOW, Edgard 4835 Barnett Road 246 Wichita Falls, TX 76310 / US | 03 /
DEPOORTER, Larry 3003 McNeil Wichita Falls, TX 76309 / US | 04 /
ODABASHIAN, Robert, A. 113 Holly Circle Greer, SC 29651 / US | 05 /
WALLINGTON, Craig 5485 Woodbridge Crest Marion, IA 52302 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98919736.3 | 03.04.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998US06854 | Priority number, date | US19970042664 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: US 42664 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845187 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971847 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971847 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B65D75/26 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B65D75/004 (EP,US);
B65D75/26 (EP,US);
B65D2275/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1307 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | BEUTEL MIT SCHUTZAUFLAGEN UND VERSCHLUSS DURCH DIE SCHUTZAUFLAGEN | [2001/21] | English: | PATCH BAG HAVING SEAL THROUGH PATCHES | [2000/03] | French: | SAC A PIECE RAPPORTEE AVEC SCELLEMENT TRAVERSANT LADITE PIECE | [2000/03] |
Former [2000/03] | SCHUTZBEUTEL MIT SIEGEL DURCH DIE SCHUTZAUFLAGEN | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 01.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.06.2002 | BE | 26.06.2002 | CH | 26.06.2002 | FI | 26.06.2002 | GR | 26.06.2002 | IT | 26.06.2002 | LI | 26.06.2002 | DK | 26.09.2002 | PT | 26.09.2002 | SE | 26.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
FI | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 26.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9600688 (GRACE W R & CO [US]); | [A]GB2291402 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |