blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975924

EP0975924 - SEED DRYER WITH AUTOMATIC CONTROL OF TEMPERATURE, AIR FLOW DIRECTION AND RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2001 [2001/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Johnston
Iowa 50131-1000 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000
Johnston, Iowa 50131-1000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUNTER, James, L.
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000
Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US
02 / PRECETTI, Cyrille
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000
Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US
03 / CHICOINE, Paul
7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue, P.O. Box 1000
Johnston, IA 50131-1000 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Thomson, Paul Anthony
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Thomson, Paul Anthony
Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98919742.114.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07203
Priority number, dateUS1997084262115.04.1997         Original published format: US 842621
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846951
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975924
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:F26B9/06, F26B21/10
[2000/05]
CPC:
F26B21/10 (EP,US); F26B21/028 (EP,US); F26B9/063 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SAATGUTTROCKNER MIT AUTOMATISCHER STEUERUNG VON TEMPERATUR, LUFTSTRÖMUNGSRICHTUNG UND LUFTDURCHFLUSSMENGE[2000/05]
English:SEED DRYER WITH AUTOMATIC CONTROL OF TEMPERATURE, AIR FLOW DIRECTION AND RATE[2000/05]
French:SECHOIR A GRAINS A REGULATION AUTOMATIQUE DE LA TEMPERATURE, DES SENS ET DEBITS DE FLUX D'AIR[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1999National basic fee paid 
09.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
09.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/35]
28.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US1580767  (SKROMME LARS J) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE764796  (CRONEMEYER HEINRICH) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XA]GB849613  (GORDON ALBERT GRAY) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,9;
 [A]FR1256412  (BP BELGIUM);
 [A]US4050164  (CAMPBELL BOWEN) [A] 1,4,9 * column W *;
 [XA]US4064638  (STANFIELD ZENAS ALLEN) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 4,9;
 [A]US4139952  (STANFIELD ZENAS A);
 [A]US4212115  (ADLER HOWARD [US]) [A] 1,4,9 * column W *;
 [X]EP0107925  (VICKERS PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 2; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP0237517  (HEID AG MASCHF [AT]);
 [A]FR2678915  (BIBOLLET JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,4,9 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9729333  (STANFIELD ZENAS A [US]) [PA] 1,4,9 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.