blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977794

EP0977794 - OXYALKYLENE-MODIFIED POLYOXYBUTYLENE ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.07.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.08.2002  [2002/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN VOORST, Ronald
Elzenstraat 50
NL-4581 AW Vogelwaarde / NL
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Raynor, John, et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Raynor, John, et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date98919853.623.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US08166
Priority number, dateUS1997084726801.05.1997         Original published format: US 847268
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9850449
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977794
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:C08G65/26, C10M107/34, C10M145/34, C10M145/36
[2000/06]
CPC:
C10M107/34 (EP,US); C08G65/26 (KR); C10M145/34 (EP,US);
C10M2209/107 (EP,US); C10N2020/01 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:MIT OXYALKYLENEN MODIFIZIERTE POLYOXYBUTYLENALKOHOLE[2000/06]
English:OXYALKYLENE-MODIFIED POLYOXYBUTYLENE ALCOHOLS[2000/06]
French:ALCOOLS POLYOXYBUTYLIQUES MODIFIES PAR OXYALKYLENE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase01.12.1999National basic fee paid 
01.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
25.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
26.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/35]
08.03.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8908671  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * claims 6,8,9 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 27 * * page 6, line 13 *;
 [X]WO9516721  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * example 1 *;
 [X]GB1036175  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-3,8 * example 1 *;
 [AD]US3966625  (TANIZAKI YOSHIHARU, et al) [AD] 1,9 * Production example 4 *;
 [A]US4985047  (SUNG RODNEY L [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * example 1A * * claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0452988  (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.