EP0990166 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TESTER INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE QUASI-AUTONOMOUS TEST INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CREDENCE SYSTEMS CORPORATION 215 Fourier Avenue Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2000/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUN, Henry, Y. 2433 Diane Marie Way Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Lock, Howard John Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Lock, Howard John Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920016.7 | 29.04.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998US08681 | Priority number, date | US19970850750 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 850750 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849575 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990166 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990166 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G06F11/263, G05B23/00, G01R31/3193, G01R31/319, G01R31/30 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
G01R31/31907 (EP,US);
G01R31/28 (KR);
G01R31/31921 (EP,US);
G01R31/3004 (EP,US);
G01R31/31935 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | G01R31/28, G06F11/263, G05B23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/14] | Title | German: | TESTSYSTEM FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTKREISE MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM QUASI-AUTONOMEN TESTINSTRUMENT | [2004/37] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TESTER INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE QUASI-AUTONOMOUS TEST INSTRUMENT | [2000/14] | French: | TESTEUR DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN INSTRUMENT DE TEST QUASI AUTONOME | [2000/14] |
Former [2000/14] | FESTSYSTEM FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTKREISE MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM QUASI-AUTONOMEN TESTINSTRUMENT | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.02.2005 | NL | 02.02.2005 | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/22] | NL | 02.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4816750 (VAN DER KLOOT ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5528136 (ROGOFF DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [X] - SAKAMOTO P ET AL, "HIGH SPEED SAMPLING CAPABILITY FOR A VLSI MIXED SIGNAL TESTER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1993), vol. -, pages 918 - 927, XP000437205 [X] 1,8-11,13 * page 919, column L, line 1 - column R, line 24; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US5059889 (HEATON DALE A [US]); | [Y]US5375075 (OGATA TERUAKI [JP], et al); | [P]US5748642 (LESMEISTER GARY J [US]) |