EP1015059 - LIGHT DELIVERY CATHETER AND METHOD FOR THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SPECTRANETICS CORPORATION 96 Talamine Court Colorado Springs Colorado 80907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states THE SPECTRANETICS CORPORATION 96 Talamine Court Colorado Springs Colorado 80907 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Latis, Inc. Suite 1350, 100 Front Street, W Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORY, Kenton, W. 3969 S.W. Wapato Avenue Portland, OR 97201 / US | 02 /
RYDELL, Mark, Anders 516 Turnpike Road Golden Valley, MN 55416 / US | 03 /
ZIEBOL, Robert 13041 Jefferson Street N.E. Blain, MN 55434 / US | 04 /
PORTER, Christopher, H. 19756 North East 127th Place Woodenville, WA 98072 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Brereton, Paul Arthur Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Brereton, Paul Arthur REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920099.3 | 30.04.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US08836 | Priority number, date | US19970846426 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 846426 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848882 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015059 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015059 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M31/00 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A61B18/245 (EP);
A61B18/24 (EP);
A61B2017/00973 (EP);
A61B2017/22014 (EP);
A61B2017/22038 (EP);
A61B2017/22074 (EP);
A61B2017/22084 (EP);
A61B2017/22087 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/206 (EP);
A61B2090/3933 (EP);
A61M2025/0037 (EP);
A61M25/003 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] | Title | German: | LICHTGEBENDER KATHETER SOWIE ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/27] | English: | LIGHT DELIVERY CATHETER AND METHOD FOR THE USE THEREOF | [2000/27] | French: | CATHETER PROJECTEUR DE LUMIERE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5458584 (GINN RICHARD ET AL) [X] 1,2,7,10 * column 6, line 31 - line 34 * * column 8, line 30 - line 39; figure 7 * * column 9, line 57 - line 62 * [Y] 3-6,9; | [Y]US5620417 (JANG YUE-TEH ET AL) [Y] 3-5,8 * column 10, line 35 - line 36; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5163905 (DON MICHAEL T ANTHONY) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 48 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9007904 (MEDILASE INC) [Y] 9 * page 5, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]EP0532109 (CORDIS EUROP) [A] 4,5 * column 4, line 16 - line 28; figure 4 * | International search | [X]US5620417 (JANG YUE-TEH [US], et al); | [YP]US5709676 (ALT ECKHARD [DE]); | [X]US5219335 (WILLARD LLOYD [US], et al); | [Y]US5292305 (BOUDEWIJN ALEXANDER C [NL], et al); | [X]US5458584 (GINN RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US5083549 (CHO GEORGE E [US], et al) | by applicant | US5304171 |