EP1007849 - AUTOMATED, QUANTITATIVE FILTRATION OF LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scilog, Inc. 14 Ellis Potter Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHICK, Karl, G. 7778 Noll Valley Road Verona, WI 53593-8721 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920237.9 | 05.05.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US09133 | Priority number, date | US19970852583 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: US 852583 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850699 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007849 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007849 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/22, B01D61/14, B01D61/16, F04B49/06 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B01D61/22 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
B01D61/16 (EP,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
G05D7/0676 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0209 (EP,US);
F04B2205/09 (EP,US);
F04B2207/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | F04B49/00, B03B5/60, B03B5/64 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [2000/24] | Title | German: | MENGENGESTEUERTE FILTERUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/24] | English: | AUTOMATED, QUANTITATIVE FILTRATION OF LIQUIDS | [2000/24] | French: | FILTRATION QUANTITATIVE AUTOMATISEE DE LIQUIDES | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.01.2007 | [2008/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6411610 ; | [A]DE8305713U (SARTORIUS GMBH) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [XAY]DE3700804 (SEWING RAINER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,16,20,21,24-27,29 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,9,14,15,17-19,23 [Y] 3,7,11-13,22,28; | [Y]EP0431300 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,7,11-13,22,28 * column 2, line 20 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO9810856 (UNION CAMP CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,4,17-19,21 * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 30 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 17; figure 1; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), & JP01011610 A 19890117 (SASAKURA ENG CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4-10,12,13,17-19,21,23-28 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4818384 (MAYER ROBERT B [US]); | [X]US5431811 (TUSINI ANDREA [IT], et al); | [X]US5520816 (KUEPPER THEODORE A [US]); | [YE]US5776345 (TRUITT LORI A [US], et al); | [Y] - "CONTENTS OF SYMS-101-01N (SYMS-201-01N FOR 220 VOLTS):.", OPERATING INSTRUCTIONS MINIKROS SAMPLER SYSTEM, XX, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 01 - 27., XP002913190 |