EP1010244 - IMPROVED SAW FILTER USING LOW-PASS CONFIGURATION AND METHOD OF PROVIDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 West Boulevard North Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENUNURI, David 10422 N. Demaret Drive Fountain Hills, AZ 85268 / US | 02 /
KOMMRUSCH, Richard, S. 938 Bobcat Boulevard N.E. Albuquerque, NM 87122 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98920364.1 | 08.05.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US09544 | Priority number, date | US19970920192 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: US 920192 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910978 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010244 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64, H03H9/72 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
H03H9/6483 (EP,KR,US);
H03H9/64 (KR);
H03H3/08 (KR);
H03H9/25 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | SAW TIEFPASSFILTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/25] | English: | IMPROVED SAW FILTER USING LOW-PASS CONFIGURATION AND METHOD OF PROVIDING THE SAME | [2000/25] | French: | FILTRE A ONDES DE SURFACE CONFIGURES EN MONTAGE PASSE-BAS ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 24.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0454011 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]JPH0661783 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US5506552 (SEKI SHUN-ICHI [JP], et al) |