EP0922170 - TWIN MASS FLYWHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AP TMF Limited Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states AP TMF Limited Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Alastair, John 39 Roundshill Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 1DW / GB | 02 /
MURPHY, Robert, John 80 Mallory Road Bishops Tachbrook Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV33 9QY / GB | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products Group Ltd. Patent Department P.O. Box 2085 Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV32 3ZT / GB | ||
Former [1999/24] | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 98920660.2 | 08.05.1998 | [1999/24] | WO1998GB01334 | Priority number, date | GB19970009436 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9709436 | GB19970015027 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9715027 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9851940 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0922170 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
F16F15/13157 (EP,US);
F16F15/131 (EP,US);
F16F15/13171 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19865 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/24] | Title | German: | ZWEIMASSEN SCHWINGRAD | [1999/24] | English: | TWIN MASS FLYWHEELS | [1999/24] | French: | VOLANT A DEUX MASSES | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4800996 (LOIZEAU PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-4,10,12,27-30,32-34 * column 4, line 38 - column 12, line 38; figure - * [A] 6-9,13,17,24,26; | [PXA]DE19627764 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,11,29,30,34 * page 1, column 1, line 3 - page 2, column 4, line 26; figure - * [A] 5-7,14,15,17,24,26,27; | [PA]GB2313898 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [PA] 1,5-10,12-16,29,30,32,34 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3607116 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1,14,15,25,29,30,32,34 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2254906 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,8-10,12,14-16,29,30,32,34 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2285109 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,22,29-32,34 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2229793 | GB2285109 | GB19760095019 | GB19610097003 |