EP0979175 - ARRANGEMENT FOR VEHICLE BODY STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Personvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | For all designated states Lear Corporation Sweden Interior Systems AB Salsmästaregatan 32 422 46 Hisings Backa / SE | [2003/03] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Volvo Personvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
For all designated states Lear Corporation Sweden Interior Systems AB Salsmästaregatan 32 422 46 Hisings Backa / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAERT, Michel Graskärsgatan 24 S-421 59 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
REICH, Hans Götagatan 21B S-432 42 Varbert / SE | 03 /
NORDLING, Lars Flatön 8705 S-474 91 Ellös / SE | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per Rune Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Andersson, Per Rune Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98920786.5 | 27.04.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998SE00761 | Priority number, date | SE19970001601 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: SE 9701601 | [2000/07] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849024 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979175 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979175 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B62D25/14, B60K37/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B62D25/142 (EP,US);
B60H1/00535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIEANORDNUNG | [2000/07] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR VEHICLE BODY STRUCTURE | [2000/07] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A LA STRUCTURE DE LA CARROSSERIE D'UN VEHICULE | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1998 | Translation filed | 30.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.2003 | BE | 15.01.2003 | CH | 15.01.2003 | FI | 15.01.2003 | FR | 15.01.2003 | GR | 15.01.2003 | IT | 15.01.2003 | LI | 15.01.2003 | NL | 15.01.2003 | DK | 15.04.2003 | PT | 15.04.2003 | SE | 15.04.2003 | CY | 27.04.2003 | LU | 27.04.2003 | IE | 28.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/49] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
FR | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
CY | 27.04.2003 | ||
LU | 27.04.2003 | ||
IE | 28.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
CY | 27.04.2003 | ||
LU | 27.04.2003 | ||
IE | 28.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
CY | 27.04.2003 | ||
LU | 27.04.2003 | ||
IE | 28.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
LU | 27.04.2003 | ||
IE | 28.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
IE | 28.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
CH | 15.01.2003 | ||
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 15.01.2003 | |
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 15.01.2003 | |
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 15.01.2003 | |
FI | 15.01.2003 | ||
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 15.01.2003 | |
LI | 15.01.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4733739 (LORENZ SIEGFRIED [DE], et al); | [X]US5088571 (BURRY DONALD L [US], et al); | [X]US5311960 (KUKAINIS JANIS [US], et al); | [X]US5549344 (NISHIJIMA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US5556153 (KELMAN JOSH [US], et al) |