Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002500647 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU741209B | Global Dossier | 22.11.2001 | B2 | AU7363498 | 11.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0983256 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2004 | B1 | EP0983256 | 08.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE261434T | 15.03.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9809673 | 11.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2288327 | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69822297T | 29.07.2004 | T2 | DE69822297D1 | 15.04.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1025954 | 01.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0003244 | 28.09.2001 | A3 | HUP0003244 | 28.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010012820 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO995722L | 21.01.2000 | L | NO995722D0 | 22.11.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ500699 | 31.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9808562 | 27.04.1998 | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9852933 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR012737 | 08.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2213279T | 16.08.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW462966B | 11.11.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA984177 | 23.11.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | US86248997 | 23.05.1997 |